+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On January 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Title printed. Carryover bill
On February 27, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Placed on General File
On January 17, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 24, 2017
On January 10, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 6, 2017 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor