+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- DeBoer priority bill
On February 4, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 11, 2020
On January 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Education Committee
On January 22, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Walz name added
On January 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (2)
DeBoer
Type:
Primary Sponsor