+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB1083 amended into LB1042 by AM2592
On August 11, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Approved by Governor on August 07, 2020
On August 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on August 03, 2020
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 47-0-2
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On July 22, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading
On July 20, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- La Grone AM3083 adopted
- La Grone AM3083 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER184 adopted
On March 5, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Select File with ER184
- Enrollment and Review ER184 filed
On March 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Pansing Brooks AM2685 adopted
- Morfeld AM2592 adopted
- Revenue AM2181 adopted
On February 27, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Pansing Brooks AM2685 filed
On February 26, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Morfeld AM2592 filed
On February 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- La Grone priority bill
- Revenue AM2181 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2181
On January 22, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for January 29, 2020
- Referred to Revenue Committee
On January 16, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (6)
August 3, 2020: Final Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Excused - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Yes
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Yes
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Excused - Not Voting
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
July 20, 2020: AM 3083 La Grone
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Excused - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Yes
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Yes
- John McCollister: Present - Not Voting
- Adam Morfeld: Excused - Not Voting
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Present - Not Voting
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
March 3, 2020: AM 2181 Revenue
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Excused - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Yes
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Yes
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Present - Not Voting
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Yes
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
March 3, 2020: AM 2592 Morfeld - AM 2685 Pansing Brooks
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Present - Not Voting
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Present - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Present - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: No
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
March 3, 2020: AM 2592 Morfeld
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 16
- Absent: 1
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Present - Not Voting
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Present - Not Voting
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Present - Not Voting
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Excused - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Present - Not Voting
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Present - Not Voting
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Present - Not Voting
- Lou Ann Linehan: Present - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Present - Not Voting
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Present - Not Voting
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Present - Not Voting
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Present - Not Voting
March 3, 2020: ADVANCE TO E&R INITIAL
- Yeas: 42
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 2
Details:
+
−
- Kate Bolz: Yes
- Ernie Chambers: Present - Not Voting
- Sue Crawford: Yes
- Sara Howard: Yes
- Rick Kolowski: Yes
- Steve Lathrop: Present - Not Voting
- Jim Scheer: Yes
- Curt Friesen: Yes
- Mike Groene: Yes
- Matt Hansen: Present - Not Voting
- Robert Hilkemann: Yes
- Dan Hughes: Yes
- Mark Kolterman: Excused - Not Voting
- Brett Lindstrom: Present - Not Voting
- John McCollister: Yes
- Adam Morfeld: Yes
- Patty Pansing Brooks: Yes
- John Stinner: Yes
- Matt Williams: Yes
- Joni Albrecht: Yes
- Carol Blood: Yes
- Bruce Bostelman: Yes
- Tom Brewer: Yes
- Tom Briese: Yes
- Steve Erdman: Yes
- Suzanne Geist: Yes
- Steve Halloran: Yes
- Mike Hilgers: Yes
- Lou Ann Linehan: Excused - Not Voting
- John Lowe: Yes
- Mike McDonnell: Yes
- Dan Quick: Yes
- Tony Vargas: Yes
- Lynne Walz: Yes
- Justin Wayne: Yes
- Anna Wishart: Yes
- Robert Clements: Yes
- John Arch: Yes
- Tom Brandt: Yes
- Machaela Cavanaugh: Yes
- Wendy DeBoer: Present - Not Voting
- Myron Dorn: Yes
- Tim Gragert: Yes
- Megan Hunt: Yes
- Andrew La Grone: Yes
- Mike Moser: Yes
- Dave Murman: Yes
- Julie Slama: Yes
- Ben Hansen: Yes
+ − Sponsor
La Grone
Type:
Primary Sponsor