+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 18, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Provisions/portions of LB1019 amended into LB1008 by AM2737
On August 13, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Indefinitely postponed
On February 3, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 18, 2020
On January 24, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Crawford name added
- Lathrop name added
On January 23, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Hilkemann name added
On January 21, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Appropriations Committee
On January 15, 2020 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Sponsors (4)
Vargas
Type:
Primary Sponsor