+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 23, 2018 in the Legislature:
On April 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Presented to Governor on April 18, 2018
- President/Speaker signed
- Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 48-0-1
- Dispensing of reading at large approved
On April 3, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Placed on Final Reading with ST51
On March 28, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
- Kolterman AM2560 adopted
- Enrollment and Review ER137 adopted
On March 21, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman AM2560 filed
- Enrollment and Review ER137 filed
- Placed on Select File with ER137
On March 20, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2204 adopted
On March 6, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Nebraska Retirement Systems AM2204 filed
- Placed on General File with AM2204
On February 7, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Nebraska Retirement Systems priority bill
On January 22, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Notice of hearing for February 02, 2018
On January 18, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Referred to Nebraska Retirement Systems Committee
On January 16, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Date of introduction
- Kolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill prevailed
On January 11, 2018 in the Legislature:
- Kolterman motion to suspend rules to permit introduction of bill filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor