+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
- Hearing
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- First Reading
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
April 19, 2013: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
April 17, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor