+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted as Amended
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted as Amended
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor