+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation on 02/11/2021
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- First Reading
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor