+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Fish and Game
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Fish and Game
- Hearing scheduled in committee Fish and Game on 02/11/2021
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Fish and Game
- First Reading
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On January 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor