+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
- Signed by President
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
April 18, 2013: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor