+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Natural Resources
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Natural Resources
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 02/08/2021
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
On January 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor