+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On November 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On November 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On October 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor