+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor