+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor