+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Not Heard at Sponsor's Request
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor