+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
- Hearing
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
April 15, 2015: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 50
March 31, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor