+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Education and Cultural Resources
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 02/26/2021
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Education and Cultural Resources
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
- First Reading
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor