+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (46)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Natural Resources
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 03/18/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Natural Resources
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Natural Resources
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Natural Resources on 01/28/2019
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Natural Resources
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Edit
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft On Hold
On December 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Jon C Sesso
Type:
Primary Sponsor