+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
- Signed by President
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted State Administration
On February 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted State Administration
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 01/28/2019
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Dee Brown
Type:
Primary Sponsor