+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor