+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Energy and Telecommunications
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Energy and Telecommunications
- Hearing scheduled in committee Energy and Telecommunications on 02/04/2021
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Energy and Telecommunications
- First Reading
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor