+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Died in Standing Committee
- Hearing
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On April 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (3)
April 20, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 19, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor