+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed Consideration
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted as Amended
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted as Amended
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor