+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
- Hearing
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On March 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
April 2, 2013: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 50
March 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor