+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Public Health, Welfare and Safety
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- Hearing scheduled in committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety on 02/20/2019
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Public Health, Welfare and Safety
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
David Howard
Type:
Primary Sponsor