+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Taxation on 04/24/2019
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Taxation
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Taxation
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Taxation
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 04/12/2019
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On December 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On November 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Dee Brown
Type:
Primary Sponsor