+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee State Administration
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee State Administration
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/01/2021
- Amendments Available
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor