+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (43)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 24, 2017 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 22, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On April 1, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Assembly
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor