+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On February 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Motion Failed
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sponsor List Modified
On January 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sponsor List Modified
On January 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On November 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On November 8, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On October 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On September 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On September 7, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Vote
February 22, 2011: Take from Judiciary Comm to 2nd R-Hinkle
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor