+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (64)
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received
- On Motion Rules Suspended
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Report Received
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 20, 2013 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
- Conference Committee Dissolved
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 16, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 12, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Hearing
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (11)
April 24, 2013: Do Adopt FC Report
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 39
April 24, 2013: Do Adopt Free Conf Comm Report
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
April 23, 2013: Do Adopt Free Conf Comm Rpt
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
April 23, 2013: Do Adopt FC Report
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 39
April 11, 2013: Do Not Concur with House Amendments
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 39
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
April 3, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 39
March 15, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 8
February 27, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 18
February 26, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
February 22, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor