+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (44)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Agriculture
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Agriculture
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture on 03/28/2019
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Agriculture
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Hearing scheduled in committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation on 02/26/2019
- Committee Report--Bill Passed Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee Agriculture, Livestock and Irrigation
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Albert Olszewski
Type:
Primary Sponsor