+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Education and Cultural Resources
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Education and Cultural Resources
- Hearing scheduled in committee Education and Cultural Resources on 03/08/2019
On January 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Introduced
- Referred to Committee Education and Cultural Resources
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Daniel R Salomon
Type:
Primary Sponsor