+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sponsors Engrossed
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for Consideration under Special Orders
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
- First Reading
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB]
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2013: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
March 14, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor