+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted State Administration
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted State Administration
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/01/2021
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor