+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Judiciary
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/02/2021
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
- First Reading
On January 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On January 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor