+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- Resolution Adopted
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Resolution Adopted Judiciary
- Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted Judiciary
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Judiciary on 02/06/2019
On January 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Judiciary
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Executive Director Final Review
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Keith Regier
Type:
Primary Sponsor