+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (48)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 16, 2017 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On January 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor