+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On February 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Executive Director Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor