+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Died in Process
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Pass Consideration
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 04/22/2021
- Amendments Available
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Draft in Edit
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Executive Director Review
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Introduced
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On January 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor