+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2015 in the House:
- Sponsors Engrossed
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Consent Calendar
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Passed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Hearing
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
On March 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 21
April 17, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 21
April 13, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 13
April 11, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
April 8, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor