+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Hearing
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
- Introduced
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On December 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
April 21, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 18
April 20, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 17
April 14, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 20
April 1, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 9
March 31, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 3
March 23, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor