+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (56)
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary of State
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules Suspended to Accept Late Return of Amended Bill
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsidered Previous Action; Placed on 2nd Reading
- On Motion Rules Suspended
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Not Concurred
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Failed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended State Administration
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended State Administration
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 03/22/2019
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee State Administration
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed State Administration
- Sponsors Engrossed
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed State Administration
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee State Administration on 02/15/2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Referred to Committee State Administration
- First Reading
- Introduced
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Ready for Delivery
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On January 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Draft Back for Requester Changes
- Draft Taken by Drafter
On December 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Kenneth Bogner
Type:
Primary Sponsor