+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (68)
On May 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 2, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On May 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Printed - New Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
- 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted
On April 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 20, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On April 19, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report Received
On April 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report Received
On April 11, 2011 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Free Conference Committee Dissolved
On April 8, 2011 in the House:
- Free Conference Committee Appointed
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 30, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On March 29, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Concurred as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
On March 28, 2011 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 23, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On February 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On December 29, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Legal Review
On December 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Back for Redo
On November 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On November 10, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 9, 2010 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On October 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On October 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On May 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (13)
April 26, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 20
April 20, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 32
- Absent: 1
April 20, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 19
April 20, 2011: Do Adopt
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 5, 2011: Do Not Concur
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 30, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 38
March 29, 2011: Do Concur as Amended
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 38
- Absent: 2
March 29, 2011: AMD-001 Peterson D/PASS
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 1
March 29, 2011: AMD-002 Peterson D/PASS
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
March 28, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
February 18, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
February 17, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 21
February 14, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor