+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (62)
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
- 2nd Reading Concurred
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Taken from Table in Committee
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On December 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft Back for Redo
- Draft Taken by Drafter
On November 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On November 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On November 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Fiscal Note Probable
On November 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Taken Off Hold
On October 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On September 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (8)
April 18, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
April 14, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 11
April 13, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 11
April 1, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 20
March 16, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 50
March 13, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
March 11, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor