+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Returned from Enrolling
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 14, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Hearing
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled
On January 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On December 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On December 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
On November 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN]
On November 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft On Hold
On October 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 12, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 6
March 11, 2015: Do Concur
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 6
February 13, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 17
January 26, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
January 24, 2015: Do Pass
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 5
January 21, 2015: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor