+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (35)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Died in Process
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- 3rd Reading Failed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Business and Labor
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business and Labor on 03/13/2019
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee Business and Labor
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 02/12/2019
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing Canceled scheduled in committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs on 01/10/2019
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Business, Labor, and Economic Affairs
On December 14, 2018 in the House:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced
On November 29, 2018 in the House:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
On November 28, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
On November 20, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
- Draft in Edit
On November 19, 2018 in the House:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 7, 2018 in the House:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On September 7, 2018 in the House:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Mary McNally
Type:
Primary Sponsor