+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (65)
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
- Returned from Enrolling
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred Appropriations
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred Appropriations
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Appropriations on 04/01/2019
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
- Fiscal Note Unsigned
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee Appropriations
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended Transportation
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended Transportation
- Taken from Table in Committee Transportation
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled in Committee Transportation
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Transportation on 02/04/2019
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee Transportation
- First Reading
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- 2nd Reading Passed as Amended
- 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended Highways and Transportation
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended Highways and Transportation
On January 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing scheduled in committee Highways and Transportation on 01/10/2019
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Signed
On January 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On January 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee Highways and Transportation
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
On November 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On November 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
On November 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On November 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On July 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Brian Hoven
Type:
Primary Sponsor