+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Died in Standing Committee
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Tabled in Committee
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
- Introduced
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Draft Delivered to Requester
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Director Final Review
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Assembly
- Executive Director Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Edit
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft to Requester for Review
On October 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor