+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (59)
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
- 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On April 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to Senate with Amendments
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Printed
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Hearing
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Revised Fiscal Note Signed
- Revised Fiscal Note Received
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Committee
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Revised Fiscal Note Requested
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Hearing
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On January 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to House
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
On January 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Printed - New Version Available
- Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Printed
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Received
On January 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Committee
On December 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Requested
On December 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
- Introduced
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 20, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On November 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
On October 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Probable
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
On October 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On September 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On June 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 2013: Do Concur with House Amendments
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2013: Do Concur with House Amendments
- Yeas: 46
- Present/NV: 4
April 15, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 12
April 12, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 21
April 9, 2013: Do Concur
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 14
March 20, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended
- Yeas: 16
January 25, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 49
- Present/NV: 1
January 24, 2013: Do Pass
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 21, 2013: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor