+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- Chapter Number Assigned
- Signed by Governor
On March 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 11, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
- Returned from Enrolling
- Printed - Enrolled Version Available
On March 10, 2011 in the House:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Concurred
- Returned to Senate
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to Enrolling
On March 9, 2011 in the House:
- 2nd Reading Concurred
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On March 5, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Report--Bill Concurred
On March 4, 2011 in the House:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Hearing
On February 5, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee
- First Reading
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for 3rd Reading
- 3rd Reading Passed
- Transmitted to House
On January 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- 2nd Reading Passed
- Scheduled for 2nd Reading
On January 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Report--Bill Passed
On January 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
On January 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Hearing
On January 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- First Reading
On December 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On December 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Introduced
- Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
On December 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pre-Introduction Letter Sent
- Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
On December 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Final Drafter Review
- Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
- Draft in Input/Proofing
- Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD]
On December 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft in Legal Review
- Draft to Requester for Review
On November 6, 2010 in the Senate:
- Draft Request Received
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 49
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2011: Do Concur
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 47
March 4, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 6
January 21, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 20, 2011: Do Pass
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 17, 2011: Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
David E Wanzenried
Type:
Primary Sponsor